OUR HISTORY
Grace Church of the Nazarene was organized on August 3rd, 1957 in the home of Joe Yarbrough, 1606 Mt. Gallant Rd (Rock Hill, SC). There were six charter members: Mr. and Mrs. Joe Yarbrough, Mr. and Mrs. Roy Dease, Mr. & Mrs. Frank Porter.
The following pastors have served:
Rev. & Mrs. Dave Erickson: September 26, 1957 until December 1957
Rev. & Mrs. Charles Nicholson: January 01, 1958 until July 01, 1959
Rev. & Mrs. Robert Agner: September 10, 1959 until September 14, 1961
Rev & Mrs. Warren Copeland: November 1, 1961 until August 1963
Rev. & Mrs. J. L. Power: September 12, 1963 until October 1, 1967
Rev. Power lead in the building of the parsonage (1964) and laid plans for the building of a Sunday School Annex.
Rev. & Mrs. R. S. Lecce: January 1, 1968 until June 1, 1971
The Sunday School Annex was finished during Rev. Leece's leadership.
Rev. & Mrs. J. D. Blackmon: August 10, 1971 until October 21, 1973
Rev. & Mrs. Edward L. Pannell: January 1, 1974 until September 1, 1975
Rev. & Mrs. John H. Day: November 10, 1975 until May 4, 1976
Rev. & Mrs. Gregory L. Keller: July 12, 1976 until May 5, 1980
Some major remodeling was done under Rev. Keller's ministry.
Rev. & Mrs. Jesse Sims: August 1, 1980 until December 28, 2003. (Associate pastor from 2004 until 2011).
During Rev. Sims' ministry, the Youth House and lot was purchased, the new sanctuary was built (1997), and remodeling of the old sanctuary and Annex was done (1997-98). The lot between the church and Family Dollar was also purchased (1997).
Rev. & Mrs. Richard I. Coleman: June 24, 2004 until August 1, 2008
During the ministry of Rev. Coleman, the church paid off its debt and purchased the Union Hall and land across the street from the church. This is the Family Life Center building.
Rev. & Mrs. Daniel R. Swan: October 27, 2008 until January 15, 2012
Some remodeling and upkeep was done during Rev. Swan's ministry.
Rev. & Mrs. Raymond Jones, Jr.: April 29, 2012 until June 2015
Rev. Thom & Vicky Harvey: February 2016 and present
During Rev. Harvey's ministry, the church paid off its dept of the Family Life Center and surrounding property.